IA SF2149 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-23 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 562.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-23 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 562.
Summary
A bill for an act relating to criminal history and abuse registry checks for employees of health care facilities and other health-related providers and requiring such checks for certified nurse aide training program students and providing a penalty. (Formerly SSB 3052.) Effective 7-1-10.
Title
A bill for an act relating to criminal history and abuse registry checks for employees of health care facilities and other health-related providers and requiring such checks for certified nurse aide training program students and providing a penalty. (Formerly SSB 3052.) Effective 7-1-10.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-23 | Signed by Governor. S.J. 562. | |
2010-02-22 | Sent to Governor. S.J. 526. | |
2010-02-22 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 526. | |
2010-02-16 | Message from House. S.J. 440. | |
2010-02-16 | Immediate message. H.J. 552. | |
2010-02-16 | Passed House, ayes 97, nays none. H.J. 550. | |
2010-02-16 | Substituted for HF 2338. H.J. 549. | |
2010-02-16 | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 537. | |
2010-02-16 | Message from Senate. H.J. 521. | |
2010-02-15 | Immediate message. S.J. 391. | |
2010-02-15 | Passed Senate, ayes 46, nays none. S.J. 390. | |
2010-02-01 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 211. | |
2010-02-01 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 208. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://coolice.legis.state.ia.us/Cool-ICE/default.asp?Category=BillInfo&Service=DspHistory&var=SF&key=0702B&ga=83 |