IA SF2142 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-19 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-19 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to public school funding by establishing a state percent of growth and the categorical state percent of growth for the budget year beginning July 1, 2020, modifying provisions and references relating to the property tax replacement payment, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3096.) Effective date: 03/12/2020.
Title
A bill for an act relating to public school funding by establishing a state percent of growth and the categorical state percent of growth for the budget year beginning July 1, 2020, modifying provisions and references relating to the property tax replacement payment, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3096.) Effective date: 03/12/2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - Passed House (Y: 51 N: 46 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - Passed House (Y: 52 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - Passed House (Y: 52 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-19 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 615. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 609. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 517. |
2020-03-04 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 455. |
2020-03-10 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 566. |
2020-03-09 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 532. |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed House, yeas 51, nays 46. H.J. 454. |
2020-03-04 | House | House concurred H-8072. H.J. 454. |
2020-03-04 | House | Point of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, ruled point not well taken. H.J. 454. |
2020-03-04 | House | Point of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, ruled point well taken. H.J. 454. |
2020-03-04 | House | Senate amendment H-8072 filed. H.J. 454. |
2020-03-04 | House | Fiscal note. |
2020-03-04 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 450. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 510. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 31, nays 17. S.J. 509. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-5005, as amended. S.J. 508. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Amendment S-5049 adopted. S.J. 508. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Amendment S-5049 filed. S.J. 504. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-5005. S.J. 280. |
2020-02-11 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 247. |
2020-02-11 | House | Passed House, yeas 52, nays 48. H.J. 245. |
2020-02-11 | House | Amendment H-8011 adopted. H.J. 244. |
2020-02-11 | House | Amendment H-8014, to amendment H-8011 lost. H.J. 244. |
2020-02-11 | House | Substituted for HF 2243. H.J. 242. |
2020-02-10 | House | Amendment H-8014, to amendment H-8011 filed. H.J. 236. |
2020-02-10 | House | Amendment H-8011 filed. H.J. 236. |
2020-02-10 | House | Fiscal note. |
2020-02-10 | House | Introduced, passed on file. H.J. 229. |
2020-02-10 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 228. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 250. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 31, nays 17. S.J. 249. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Amendment S-5003 filed, lost. S.J. 248. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 204. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28. S.J. 202. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3096 (Related) 2020-02-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2142.