IA SF2142 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-18 - Rereferred to State Government. H.J. 507.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to voter registration and voting by lowering the age at which a person may register to vote and the age at which a registered voter is eligible to vote in a primary election and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SF 2001.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to voter registration and voting by lowering the age at which a person may register to vote and the age at which a registered voter is eligible to vote in a primary election and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SF 2001.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-18HouseRereferred to State Government. H.J. 507.
2016-03-11HousePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 456.
2016-03-03HouseFiscal note. HCS.
2016-03-02HouseRead first time, passed on file. H.J. 379.
2016-03-01HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 375.
2016-03-01SenateImmediate message. S.J. 410.
2016-03-01SenatePassed Senate, ayes 49, nays none. S.J. 409.
2016-03-01SenateDeferred. S.J. 401.
2016-02-29SenateDeferred. S.J. 385.
2016-02-29SenateAmendment S-5004 adopted. S.J. 385.
2016-02-15SenateFiscal note. SCS.
2016-02-10SenateAmendment S-5004 filed. S.J. 208.
2016-02-09SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 194.
2016-02-09SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 187.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback