IA SF2135 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-01 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 658.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the final disposition and disinterment of human remains. (Formerly SSB 3056.) Effective date: 07/01/2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the final disposition and disinterment of human remains. (Formerly SSB 3056.) Effective date: 07/01/2020.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-04 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-01HouseSigned by Governor. S.J. 658.
2020-06-01HouseReported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 658.
2020-03-04HouseMessage from House. S.J. 526.
2020-03-04SenateImmediate message. H.J. 467.
2020-03-10SenateExplanation of vote. H.J. 566.
2020-03-09SenateExplanation of vote. H.J. 532.
2020-03-04SenatePassed House, yeas 97, nays none. H.J. 462.
2020-03-04SenateSubstituted for HF 2472. H.J. 462.
2020-03-04SenateMessage from House. S.J. 526.
2020-03-03HouseRead first time, passed on file. H.J. 419.
2020-02-27HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 404.
2020-02-27SenateImmediate message. S.J. 457.
2020-02-27SenatePassed Senate, yeas 46, nays 3. S.J. 456.
2020-02-27SenateAmendments S-5010 adopted. S.J. 455.
2020-02-27SenateAmendment S-5026 lost. S.J. 455.
2020-02-26SenateAmendment S-5026 filed. S.J. 452.
2020-02-24SenateDeferred. S.J. 383.
2020-02-24SenateAmendment S-5010 filed. S.J. 383.
2020-01-31SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 196.
2020-01-31SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28. S.J. 192.

Same As/Similar To

SSB3056 (Related) 2020-01-31 - Reported out of committee as SF 2135.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback