IA SF2123 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-04 - Fiscal note. SCS.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act making changes to the controlled substance schedules, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SSB 3041.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act making changes to the controlled substance schedules, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SSB 3041.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-04 Fiscal note. SCS.
2012-04-02 Message from House, with amendment S-5157. S.J. 697.
2012-03-29 Immediate message. H.J. 704.
2012-03-29 Explanation of vote. H.J. 705.
2012-03-29 Passed House, ayes 93, nays none. H.J. 700.
2012-03-29 Amendment H-8280 adopted. H.J. 700.
2012-03-29 Amendment H-8284 as amended, adopted. H.J. 700.
2012-03-29 Amendment H-8344 adopted. H.J. 699.
2012-03-29 Amendment H-8391 filed, adopted. H.J. 699.
2012-03-26 Amendment H-8344 filed. H.J. 644.
2012-03-21 Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 627.
2012-03-19 Amendments H-8280 and H-8284 filed. H.J. 583.
2012-03-14 Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 570.
2012-03-13 Subcommittee, Worthan, Abdul-Samad, and S. Olson. H.J. 561.
2012-02-29 Read first time, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 381.
2012-02-28 Message from Senate. H.J. 342.
2012-02-27 Immediate message. S.J. 344.
2012-02-27 Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 343.
2012-02-02 Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 184.
2012-02-02 Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 180.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback