IA SF2122 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2249. S.J. 312.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2249. S.J. 312.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the classification and reclassification of certain secondary roads, and including applicability provisions. (See SF 2249.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the classification and reclassification of certain secondary roads, and including applicability provisions. (See SF 2249.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2249. S.J. 312. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/11/2020 8:30AM RM G17. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Subcommittee: Brown, J. Smith, and Zumbach. S.J. 187. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Transportation. S.J. 184. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2249 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF2122 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF2122.html |