IA SF2119 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-01 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 658.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-01 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 658.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to controlled substances, including amending the controlled substance schedules, removing certain references to marijuana, making penalties applicable, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3050.) Effective date: 06/01/2020.
Title
A bill for an act relating to controlled substances, including amending the controlled substance schedules, removing certain references to marijuana, making penalties applicable, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3050.) Effective date: 06/01/2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 658. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 658. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 588. |
2020-03-10 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 564. |
2020-03-10 | House | Passed House, yeas 99, nays 1. H.J. 554. |
2020-03-10 | House | Point of order raised on H-8118, ruled not germane. H.J. 554. |
2020-03-10 | House | Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 554. |
2020-03-10 | House | Motion to suspend rules for consideration of H-8137, to amendment H-8118. H.J. 553. |
2020-03-10 | House | Point of order raised on H-8137, to amendment H-8118, ruled not germane. H.J. 553. |
2020-03-10 | House | Amendment H-8137, to amendment H-8118 filed. H.J. 553. |
2020-03-10 | House | Substituted for HF 2413. H.J. 552. |
2020-03-09 | House | Amendment H-8118 filed. H.J. 534. |
2020-03-05 | House | Passed on file. H.J. 513. |
2020-02-11 | House | Read first time, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 238. |
2020-02-10 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 227. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 253. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 252. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 188. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28. S.J. 184. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3050 (Related) 2020-01-30 - Reported out of committee as SF 2119.
HSB609 (Related) 2020-02-13 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 277.
HF2413 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 565.
HSB609 (Related) 2020-02-13 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 277.
HF2413 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 565.