IA SF2103 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-31 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-31 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act requiring that school districts post information on mental health resources online.
Title
A bill for an act requiring that school districts post information on mental health resources online.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Taylor [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-31 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/31/2024 2:30PM Room 315. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Subcommittee: J. Taylor, Green, and Trone Garriott. S.J. 152. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Education. S.J. 144. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SF2103 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SF2103.html |