IA SF2099 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1087.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to probate and the administration of small estates and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 3009.) Various effective dates; see sections 6 and 7 of bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to probate and the administration of small estates and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 3009.) Various effective dates; see sections 6 and 7 of bill.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 85 N: 1 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16SenateSigned by Governor. S.J. 1087.
2018-05-05SenateReported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1086.
2018-05-05SenateMessage from House. S.J. 1060.
2018-05-04HouseImmediate message. H.J. 971.
2018-05-04HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 996.
2018-05-04HouseExplanations of votes. H.J. 972.
2018-05-04HousePassed House, ayes 85, nays 1. H.J. 955.
2018-05-04HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment H-8338. H.J. 954.
2018-05-02HouseFiscal note.
2018-04-03HouseFiscal note.
2018-03-29HouseSenate amendment H-8338 filed. H.J. 711.
2018-03-29HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 704.
2018-03-28SenateImmediate message. S.J. 804.
2018-03-28SenatePassed Senate, ayes 46, nays 0. S.J. 801.
2018-03-28SenateSenate concurred with S-5142, as amended. S.J. 801.
2018-03-28SenateAmendment S-5200 to S-5142 filed, adopted. S.J. 801.
2018-03-13SenateMessage from House, with amendment S-5142. S.J. 648.
2018-03-12HouseImmediate message. H.J. 566.
2018-03-12HousePassed House, ayes 98 nays none. H.J. 558.
2018-03-12HouseAmendment H-8187 out of order. H.J. 557.
2018-03-12HouseAmendment H-8212 adopted. H.J. 557.
2018-03-12HouseAmendment H-8185 withdrawn. H.J. 557.
2018-03-12HouseSubstituted for HF 2128. H.J. 557.
2018-03-07HouseAmendment H-8212 filed. H.J. 517.
2018-03-06HouseAmendments H-8185 and H-8187 filed. H.J. 489.
2018-02-20HouseRead first time, passed on file. H.J. 311.
2018-02-19HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 299.
2018-02-19SenateImmediate message. S.J. 366.
2018-02-19SenatePassed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0. S.J. 365.
2018-01-29SenateFiscal note.
2018-01-24SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 157.
2018-01-24SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 151.

Same As/Similar To

HSB501 (Related) 2018-01-17 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SSB3009 (Related) 2018-01-17 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF2128 (Similar To) 2018-03-12 - Withdrawn. H.J. 566.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback