IA SF2092 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-03 - Withdrawn. S.J. 638.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-03 - Withdrawn. S.J. 638.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the privacy of a victim of a sex offense in a criminal or civil proceeding. (Formerly SF 2005.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the privacy of a victim of a sex offense in a criminal or civil proceeding. (Formerly SF 2005.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-03 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 638. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | HF 2445 substituted. S.J. 637. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Attached to companion HF 2445. S.J. 501. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 164. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28. S.J. 157. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2005 (Similar To) 2020-01-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2092. S.J. 164.
HF2054 (Similar To) 2020-03-03 - Withdrawn. H.J. 442.
HF2445 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Signed by Governor.
HF2054 (Similar To) 2020-03-03 - Withdrawn. H.J. 442.
HF2445 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Signed by Governor.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF2092 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF2092.html |