IA SF2085 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act requiring school districts and accredited nonpublic schools to issue high school credit for satisfactory completion of high school-level units of instruction. (See SF 2318.)
Title
A bill for an act requiring school districts and accredited nonpublic schools to issue high school credit for satisfactory completion of high school-level units of instruction. (See SF 2318.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Subcommittee: Chelgren, Dvorsky, and C. Johnson. S.J. 182. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Education. S.J. 140. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2318 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 959.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF2085 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF2085.html |