IA SF2081 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act modifying appropriation amounts for payment of commercial and industrial property tax replacement claims and including effective date provisions. (See SF 2420.)
Title
A bill for an act modifying appropriation amounts for payment of commercial and industrial property tax replacement claims and including effective date provisions. (See SF 2420.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Subcommittee: Schneider, Bolkcom, and Chelgren. S.J. 427. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Appropriations. S.J. 139. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2420 (Similar To) 2018-05-04 - NOBA: Senate Full Approps
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF2081 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF2081.html |