IA SF2071 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 962.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 962.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to bingo games, including the price to play and the value of merchandise prizes. Effective date: 07/01/2024.
Title
A bill for an act relating to bingo games, including the price to play and the value of merchandise prizes. Effective date: 07/01/2024.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 83 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 83 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - Shall amendment H–8307 be adopted? (Y: 83 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 83 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - Shall amendment H–8307 be adopted? (Y: 83 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 962. |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 961. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 804. |
2024-04-10 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 771. |
2024-04-10 | House | Passed House, yeas 83, nays 14. H.J. 767. |
2024-04-10 | House | Amendment H-8307, yeas 34, nays 63, filed, lost. H.J. 766. |
2024-03-21 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 635. |
2024-03-18 | House | Placed on calendar. H.J. 608. |
2024-03-06 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 608. |
2024-03-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2024-03-05 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/06/2024 7:30AM House Lounge. |
2024-03-05 | House | Subcommittee: Lundgren, Cooling and Wulf. H.J. 509. |
2024-02-26 | House | Read first time, referred to State Government. H.J. 386. |
2024-02-26 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 385. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 380. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 45, nays 1. S.J. 379. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 205. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/29/2024 12:30PM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Subcommittee: Schultz, Bisignano, and Cournoyer. S.J. 138. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to State Government. S.J. 124. |