IA SF2070 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - Subcommittee: Chapman, Cournoyer, and Jochum. S.J. 162.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - Subcommittee: Chapman, Cournoyer, and Jochum. S.J. 162.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to trusts for persons with disabilities.
Title
A bill for an act relating to trusts for persons with disabilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | Senate | Subcommittee: Chapman, Cournoyer, and Jochum. S.J. 162. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to State Government. S.J. 127. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2295 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Withdrawn. H.J. 484.
HF2526 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 682.
HF2526 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 682.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF2070 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF2070.html |