IA SF2067 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-22 - Subcommittee: Bacon, Maxwell and Olson. H.J. 372.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-22 - Subcommittee: Bacon, Maxwell and Olson. H.J. 372.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to lighted headlamps on motor vehicles, and making penalties applicable.
Title
A bill for an act relating to lighted headlamps on motor vehicles, and making penalties applicable.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Shipley [R] |
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | House | Subcommittee: Bacon, Maxwell and Olson. H.J. 372. |
2018-02-20 | House | Read first time, referred to Transportation. H.J. 310. |
2018-02-19 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 298. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 366. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays 1. S.J. 364. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Amendment S-5012 filed, adopted. S.J. 363. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 217. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Subcommittee: Kraayenbrink, Lykam, and Zumbach. S.J. 145. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Transportation. S.J. 126. |