IA SF2060 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-25 - Withdrawn. S.J. 806.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-25 - Withdrawn. S.J. 806.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to massage therapy, including child and dependent adult abuse reporting and continuing education requirements, and making penalties applicable.
Title
A bill for an act relating to massage therapy, including child and dependent adult abuse reporting and continuing education requirements, and making penalties applicable.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Edler [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 806. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | HF 2168 substituted. S.J. 805. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Attached to companion HF 2168. S.J. 625. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 552. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 265. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/03/2022 12:00PM Senate Lounge. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Subcommittee: Brown, Celsi, and Cournoyer. S.J. 127. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to State Government. S.J. 108. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB509 (Related) 2022-01-31 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2168.
HF2168 (Similar To) 2022-05-23 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 901.
HF2168 (Similar To) 2022-05-23 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 901.