IA SF2060 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing a scenic byways enhancement fund, including by providing for voluntary contributions to the fund, and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act establishing a scenic byways enhancement fund, including by providing for voluntary contributions to the fund, and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/26/2020 2:30PM RM G17. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Subcommittee: Dawson, Brown, and Giddens. S.J. 151. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 120. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF2060 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF2060.html |