IA SF2056 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-25 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement.
Pending: Senate Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-25 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement.
Pending: Senate Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the development of an actionable strategic plan to promote and support breastfeeding in the state.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the development of an actionable strategic plan to promote and support breastfeeding in the state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-25 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2022 3:00PM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Subcommittee: Sweeney, Rowley, and Trone Garriott. S.J. 127. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. S.J. 107. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SF2056 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SF2056.html |