IA SF2056 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/05/2020 9:30AM RM 315.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/05/2020 9:30AM RM 315.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to seizure disorders and establishing certain requirements for school districts, accredited nonpublic schools, and the department of education, and providing immunity from criminal and civil liability for certain persons who provide related assistance or services.
Title
A bill for an act relating to seizure disorders and establishing certain requirements for school districts, accredited nonpublic schools, and the department of education, and providing immunity from criminal and civil liability for certain persons who provide related assistance or services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/05/2020 9:30AM RM 315. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Subcommittee: Cournoyer, Edler, and Wahls. S.J. 138. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Education. S.J. 119. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2090 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF2056 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF2056.html |