IA SF2054 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-30 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-30 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to consumer protection modifying provisions applicable to consumer security freezes and including effective date provisions. (See SF 2177.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to consumer protection modifying provisions applicable to consumer security freezes and including effective date provisions. (See SF 2177.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-30 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Subcommittee: Zaun, Chapman, and McCoy. S.J. 144. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Commerce. S.J. 115. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2177 (Similar To) 2018-04-10 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 902.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF2054 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF2054.html |