IA SF204 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-07 - * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * *
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-07 - * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * *
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the department of elder affairs and services provided to older Iowans. (Formerly SSB 1160.) Effective 7-1-09.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the department of elder affairs and services provided to older Iowans. (Formerly SSB 1160.) Effective 7-1-09.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-07 | * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * * | |
2009-03-25 | Signed by Governor. S.J. 848. | |
2009-03-23 | Sent to Governor. S.J. 803. | |
2009-03-23 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 803. | |
2009-03-05 | Message from House. S.J. 519. | |
2009-03-04 | Immediate message. H.J. 673. | |
2009-03-04 | Passed House, ayes 67, nays 29. H.J. 672. | |
2009-03-04 | Substituted for HF 403. H.J. 671. | |
2009-02-26 | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 594. | |
2009-02-26 | Message from Senate. H.J. 588. | |
2009-02-26 | Immediate message. S.J. 437. | |
2009-02-26 | Explanation of vote. S.J. 453. | |
2009-02-26 | Passed Senate, ayes 47, nays none. S.J. 435. | |
2009-02-23 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 382. | |
2009-02-23 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 373. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://coolice.legis.state.ia.us/Cool-ICE/default.asp?Category=BillInfo&Service=DspHistory&var=SF&key=0228B&ga=83 |