IA SF2033 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Subcommittee: Feenstra, Dotzler, and Smith. S.J. 119.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Subcommittee: Feenstra, Dotzler, and Smith. S.J. 119.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act amending the definition of small city for purposes of eligibility under the workforce housing tax incentives program, including effective date and applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act amending the definition of small city for purposes of eligibility under the workforce housing tax incentives program, including effective date and applicability provisions.
Sponsors
Sen. Tod Bowman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | Senate | Subcommittee: Feenstra, Dotzler, and Smith. S.J. 119. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 81. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2004 (Similar To) 2018-03-21 - Withdrawn. H.J. 651.
HF2463 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Subcommittee: Feenstra, Behn, and Hogg. S.J. 772.
HF2463 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Subcommittee: Feenstra, Behn, and Hogg. S.J. 772.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF2033 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF2033.html |