IA SF2029 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-19 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-19 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing that a licensed veterinarian is immune from administrative, civil, or criminal liability in investigations or proceedings involving the mistreatment of animals.
Title
A bill for an act providing that a licensed veterinarian is immune from administrative, civil, or criminal liability in investigations or proceedings involving the mistreatment of animals.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Dawson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/13/2020 3:30PM RM 315. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Subcommittee: Dawson, Bisignano, and Schultz. S.J. 128. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 104. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB556 (Related) 2020-02-11 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 254.
HF2374 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Subcommittee: Rozenboom, Bisignano, and Schultz. S.J. 543.
HF2374 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Subcommittee: Rozenboom, Bisignano, and Schultz. S.J. 543.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF2029 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF2029.html |