IA SF2028 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2335. S.J. 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2335. S.J. 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to required written consent prior to immunization or vaccination of a minor.(See SF 2335.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to required written consent prior to immunization or vaccination of a minor.(See SF 2335.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2335. S.J. 325. |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2022 8:30AM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Subcommittee: Johnson, Green, and Trone Garriott. S.J. 126. |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. S.J. 94. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2335 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Referred to Human Resources. S.J. 621.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SF2028 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SF2028.html |