IA SF2019 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Subcommittee: R. Smith, Jochum, and Miller-Meeks. S.J. 121.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the practice of pharmacy, including the prescription and administration of vaccines. (See SSB 3164, SF 2343.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the practice of pharmacy, including the prescription and administration of vaccines. (See SSB 3164, SF 2343.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-21SenateSubcommittee: R. Smith, Jochum, and Miller-Meeks. S.J. 121.
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced, referred to State Government. S.J. 66.

Same As/Similar To

HSB583 (Related) 2020-02-05 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SSB3164 (Related) 2020-02-19 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2343.
SF2343 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 374.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback