IA SF2010 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to safety and sanitation criteria for tattooing establishments, and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to safety and sanitation criteria for tattooing establishments, and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
Sen. Jesse Green [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/10/2022 11:30AM Room G15. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Green, Rowley, and Bolkcom. S.J. 212. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Subcommittee: Johnson, Bolkcom, and Green. S.J. 110. |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. S.J. 62. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SF2010 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SF2010.html |