IA SF20 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-13 - Subcommittee: Carlin, Giddens, and Lofgren. S.J. 96.
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-13 - Subcommittee: Carlin, Giddens, and Lofgren. S.J. 96.
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the frequency of card game tournaments conducted by organizations representing veterans.(See SSB 1143, SF 510.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the frequency of card game tournaments conducted by organizations representing veterans.(See SSB 1143, SF 510.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Subcommittee: Carlin, Giddens, and Lofgren. S.J. 96. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Veterans Affairs. S.J. 24. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1143 (Related) 2021-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 510.
SF510 (Similar To) 2021-04-01 - Referred to Veterans Affairs. S.J. 726.
SF510 (Similar To) 2021-04-01 - Referred to Veterans Affairs. S.J. 726.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SF20 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SF20.html |