IA SF197 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-10 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 608.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-10 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 608.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act concerning the display of the POW/MIA flag on public buildings.
Title
A bill for an act concerning the display of the POW/MIA flag on public buildings.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Dawson [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-10 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 608. |
2017-03-09 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 568. |
2017-03-07 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 520. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 497. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0. S.J. 496. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 428. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Subcommittee: Edler, Dawson, and Ragan. S.J. 254. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Veterans Affairs. S.J. 246. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Subcommittee: Dawson, Horn, and Smith. S.J. 244. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, referred to State Government. S.J. 219. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB154 (Related) 2017-03-01 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 495.
HF585 (Similar To) 2018-01-08 - Rereferred to Veterans Affairs. H.J. 20.
HF585 (Similar To) 2018-01-08 - Rereferred to Veterans Affairs. H.J. 20.