IA SF194 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 332. S.J. 340.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 332. S.J. 340.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to motor vehicle window tint, including an application process for approved window tint status, making appropriations, providing penalties, and making penalties applicable.(See SF 332.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to motor vehicle window tint, including an application process for approved window tint status, making appropriations, providing penalties, and making penalties applicable.(See SF 332.)
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Edler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-11 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 332. S.J. 340. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/03/2021 8:30AM RM 111. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Subcommittee: Driscoll, Koelker, and J. Smith. S.J. 222. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Transportation. S.J. 203. |
Same As/Similar To
SF332 (Similar To) 2022-01-27 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF531 (Similar To) 2021-02-15 - Introduced, referred to Transportation. H.J. 392.
HF531 (Similar To) 2021-02-15 - Introduced, referred to Transportation. H.J. 392.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SF194 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SF194.html |