IA SF194 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 332. S.J. 340.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to motor vehicle window tint, including an application process for approved window tint status, making appropriations, providing penalties, and making penalties applicable.(See SF 332.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to motor vehicle window tint, including an application process for approved window tint status, making appropriations, providing penalties, and making penalties applicable.(See SF 332.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-11SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 332. S.J. 340.
2021-02-03SenateSubcommittee recommends passage.
2021-02-02SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 02/03/2021 8:30AM RM 111.
2021-02-02SenateSubcommittee: Driscoll, Koelker, and J. Smith. S.J. 222.
2021-02-01SenateIntroduced, referred to Transportation. S.J. 203.

Same As/Similar To

SF332 (Similar To) 2021-04-01 - Referred to Transportation. S.J. 726.
HF531 (Similar To) 2021-02-15 - Introduced, referred to Transportation. H.J. 392.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback