IA SF193 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 555. S.J. 524.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to requirements and prohibitions relating to vaccines and immunizations, and providing civil remedies.(See SF 555.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to requirements and prohibitions relating to vaccines and immunizations, and providing civil remedies.(See SF 555.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-04SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 555. S.J. 524.
2021-02-16SenateSubcommittee recommends passage.
2021-02-11SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 02/16/2021 3:00PM RM 24A.
2021-02-10SenateSubcommittee: Carlin, Costello, and Jochum. S.J. 312.
2021-02-01SenateIntroduced, referred to Human Resources. S.J. 203.

Same As/Similar To

SF555 (Similar To) 2021-04-01 - Referred to Human Resources. S.J. 726.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback