IA SF177 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-07 - * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * *

Summary

A bill for an act relating to requirements for school districts providing transportation to students participating in open enrollment. (Formerly SSB 1175.) Effective 7-1-09.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to requirements for school districts providing transportation to students participating in open enrollment. (Formerly SSB 1175.) Effective 7-1-09.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-01-07 * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * *
2009-03-23 Signed by Governor. S.J. 839.
2009-03-20 Sent to Governor. S.J. 803.
2009-03-20 Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 803.
2009-03-05 Message from House. S.J. 519.
2009-03-04 Immediate message. H.J. 675.
2009-03-04 Passed House, ayes 66, nays 32. H.J. 674.
2009-03-04 Substituted for HF 328. H.J. 673.
2009-02-26 Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 593.
2009-02-26 Message from Senate. H.J. 588.
2009-02-26 Immediate message. S.J. 440.
2009-02-26 Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays none. S.J. 438.
2009-02-18 Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 348.
2009-02-18 Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 340.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback