IA SF174 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-15 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-15 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act authorizing Carroll and Clay counties to issue driver’s licenses, nonoperator identification cards, and persons with disabilities identification devices. (See SF 312.)
Title
A bill for an act authorizing Carroll and Clay counties to issue driver’s licenses, nonoperator identification cards, and persons with disabilities identification devices. (See SF 312.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-15 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Subcommittee: Greene, Bisignano, and Breitbach. S.J. 225. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Transportation. S.J. 195. |
Same As/Similar To
SF312 (Similar To) 2017-04-03 - Withdrawn. S.J. 852.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF174 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF174.html |