IA SF165 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-06 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/11/2019 11:00AM RM 116.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to carrying and possessing weapons and acquiring pistols and revolvers, providing penalties, and including applicability provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to carrying and possessing weapons and acquiring pistols and revolvers, providing penalties, and including applicability provisions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-06SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 02/11/2019 11:00AM RM 116.
2019-02-04SenateSubcommittee: Schultz, Bisignano, and Whiting. S.J. 216.
2019-01-31SenateIntroduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 206.

Same As/Similar To

HF118 (Similar To) 2019-02-19 - Subcommittee: Windschitl, Klein, Wessel-Kroeschell. H.J. 313.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback