IA SF151 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-04 - Referred to Public Safety. H.J. 1135.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-04 - Referred to Public Safety. H.J. 1135.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing an orientation and classification center at the Iowa correctional institution for women and at the Anamosa state penitentiary. (Formerly SSB 1022.)
Title
A bill for an act establishing an orientation and classification center at the Iowa correctional institution for women and at the Anamosa state penitentiary. (Formerly SSB 1022.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-17 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | House | Referred to Public Safety. H.J. 1135. |
2015-04-14 | House | Amendments H-1216 and H-1224 filed. H.J. 844. |
2015-04-09 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 814. |
2015-03-26 | House | Committee amendment H-1158 filed. H.J. 720. |
2015-03-26 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 719. |
2015-03-24 | House | Passed subcommittee. |
2015-03-19 | House | Subcommittee, Holt, Brown-Powers, and Heartsill. H.J. 661. |
2015-03-17 | House | Read first time, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 618. |
2015-03-17 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 615. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 611. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 607. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Amendment S-3042 adopted. S.J. 606. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Deferred. S.J. 601. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Amendment S-3042 filed. S.J. 601. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 224. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 222. |