IA SF151 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-07 - * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * *
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-07 - * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * *
Summary
A bill for an act relating to railway assistance and passenger rail service, including provisions for the administration of the railway revolving loan and grant fund, the elimination of the railway finance authority, and the administration of the passenger rail service revolving fund. (Formerly SSB 1167.) Effective 7-1-09.
Title
A bill for an act relating to railway assistance and passenger rail service, including provisions for the administration of the railway revolving loan and grant fund, the elimination of the railway finance authority, and the administration of the passenger rail service revolving fund. (Formerly SSB 1167.) Effective 7-1-09.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-07 | * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * * | |
2009-05-04 | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1279. | |
2009-04-26 | Sent to Governor. S.J. 1279. | |
2009-04-26 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 1279. | |
2009-04-08 | Message from Senate. H.J. 1286. | |
2009-04-08 | Immediate message. S.J. 1020. | |
2009-04-08 | Passed Senate, ayes 36, nays 13. S.J. 1017. | |
2009-04-08 | Senate concurred with S-3186. S.J. 1017. | |
2009-04-06 | Message from House, with amendment S-3186. S.J. 952. | |
2009-04-02 | Immediate message. H.J. 1128. | |
2009-04-02 | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1155. | |
2009-04-02 | Passed House, ayes 96, nays none. H.J. 1116. | |
2009-04-02 | Amendment H-1258 withdrawn. H.J. 1116. | |
2009-04-02 | Ruled not germane H-1257. H.J. 1116. | |
2009-04-02 | Point of order raised H-1257 not germane. H.J. 1116. | |
2009-04-02 | Ruled not germane H-1256. H.J. 1114. | |
2009-04-02 | Point of order raised H-1256 not germane. H.J. 1114. | |
2009-04-02 | Committee amendment H-1310 adopted. H.J. 1112. | |
2009-04-01 | Fiscal note. HCS. | |
2009-03-26 | Committee amendment H-1310 filed. H.J. 1051. | |
2009-03-26 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 1050. | |
2009-03-23 | Amendments H-1256, H-1257, and H-1258 filed. H.J. 992. | |
2009-03-23 | Subcommittee, Bell, D. Olson, and Roberts. H.J. 990. | |
2009-03-18 | Referred to Transportation. H.J. 885. | |
2009-03-11 | Fiscal note. HCS. | |
2009-03-02 | Passed on file. H.J. 638. | |
2009-02-25 | Read first time, referred to Transportation. H.J. 574. | |
2009-02-25 | Message from Senate. H.J. 573. | |
2009-02-24 | Immediate message. S.J. 403. | |
2009-02-24 | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 403. | |
2009-02-24 | Amendment S-3027 filed, adopted. S.J. 402. | |
2009-02-12 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 292. | |
2009-02-12 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 290. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://coolice.legis.state.ia.us/Cool-ICE/default.asp?Category=BillInfo&Service=DspHistory&var=SF&key=0170B&ga=83 |