IA SF150 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-31 - Subcommittee: Dickey, Koelker, and Quirmbach. S.J. 217.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to an exception to the real estate transfer tax for deeds that transfer distributions of assets to beneficiaries of a trust.(Formerly SSB 1007.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to an exception to the real estate transfer tax for deeds that transfer distributions of assets to beneficiaries of a trust.(Formerly SSB 1007.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-01-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-01-31SenateSubcommittee: Dickey, Koelker, and Quirmbach. S.J. 217.
2023-01-30SenateReferred to Ways and Means. S.J. 204.
2023-01-26SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 199.
2023-01-26SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 192.

Same As/Similar To

SSB1007 (Related) 2023-01-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 150.
HSB4 (Related) 2023-01-24 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 179.
HF111 (Similar To) 2023-06-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1038.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback