IA SF141 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-14 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to access to and use of the county land record information system.(Formerly SSB 1029.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to access to and use of the county land record information system.(Formerly SSB 1029.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-01-26 - Senate - Senate Local Government Report (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Report (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-14SenateSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
2023-02-13SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 02/14/2023 12:00PM Room 217 Conference Room.
2023-01-31SenateSubcommittee: Koelker, Dawson, and Quirmbach. S.J. 217.
2023-01-30SenateReferred to Ways and Means. S.J. 204.
2023-01-26SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 200.
2023-01-26SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 191.

Same As/Similar To

SSB1029 (Related) 2023-01-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 141.
HSB164 (Related) 2023-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 551.
HF551 (Similar To) 2023-05-04 - Rereferred to Local Government. H.J. 1029.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback