IA SF138 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-13 - Subcommittee reassigned, Hancock, Hahn, and Heckroth. S.J. 65.

Summary

A bill for an act requiring the use of child restraint systems or seat belts by motor vehicle passengers under eighteen years of age and making a penalty applicable.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act requiring the use of child restraint systems or seat belts by motor vehicle passengers under eighteen years of age and making a penalty applicable.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-01-13 Subcommittee reassigned, Hancock, Hahn, and Heckroth. S.J. 65.
2010-01-07 * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * *
2009-02-19 Subcommittee, Dandekar, Hahn, and Hancock. S.J. 365.
2009-02-11 Introduced, referred to Transportation. S.J. 279.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback