IA SF130 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-17 - Withdrawn. S.J. 799.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the application for a certificate of franchise authority applicable to the provision of video services and including effective date provisions.(Formerly SSB 1019.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the application for a certificate of franchise authority applicable to the provision of video services and including effective date provisions.(Formerly SSB 1019.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-01-25 - Senate - Senate Commerce Report (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce Report (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-17SenateWithdrawn. S.J. 799.
2023-04-17SenateHF 250 substituted. S.J. 798.
2023-04-17SenateAmendment S-3124 adopted. S.J. 798.
2023-04-12SenateAmendment S-3124 filed. S.J. 774.
2023-03-30SenatePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 721.
2023-02-16SenateAttached to HF 250. S.J. 348.
2023-01-25SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 186.
2023-01-25SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 182.

Same As/Similar To

SSB1019 (Related) 2023-01-25 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 130.
HSB34 (Related) 2023-02-09 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 250.
HF250 (Similar To) 2023-04-28 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 952.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback