IA SF128 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-25 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-25 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing an education savings grant program for certain pupils attending a nonpublic school, establishing an education savings grant fund, providing an income tax exemption, making appropriations, providing penalties, and including applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act establishing an education savings grant program for certain pupils attending a nonpublic school, establishing an education savings grant fund, providing an income tax exemption, making appropriations, providing penalties, and including applicability provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-25 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2022 10:30AM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Carlin, Celsi, and Zaun. S.J. 79. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Subcommittee: Carlin, Celsi, and Zaun. S.J. 172. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Education. S.J. 138. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SF128 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SF128.html |