IA SF125 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 874.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to controlled substances, including amending certain controlled substances schedules and precursor substances reporting requirements, making penalties applicable, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly SSB 1041.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to controlled substances, including amending certain controlled substances schedules and precursor substances reporting requirements, making penalties applicable, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly SSB 1041.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-01-25 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services Report (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health And Human Services Report (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-19SenateWithdrawn. S.J. 874.
2023-04-19SenateHF 128 substituted. S.J. 873.
2023-03-30SenatePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 721.
2023-02-07SenateAttached to HF 128. S.J. 278.
2023-01-25SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 186.
2023-01-25SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 182.

Same As/Similar To

HSB25 (Related) 2023-01-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 128.
SSB1041 (Related) 2023-01-25 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 125.
HF128 (Similar To) 2023-05-03 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1015.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback