IA SF125 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-09 - Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 303.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to immunization information requested on a medical examiner investigation form.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to immunization information requested on a medical examiner investigation form.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Human Resources Report (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-09SenateCommittee report, recommending passage. S.J. 303.
2021-02-02SenateSubcommittee recommends passage.
2021-01-28SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 02/02/2021 1:00PM RM 24A.
2021-01-26SenateSubcommittee: Carlin, Bolkcom, and Lofgren. S.J. 161.
2021-01-21SenateIntroduced, referred to Human Resources. S.J. 137.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback