IA SF125 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 500. S.J. 489.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the establishment of a needle exchange program by the Iowa department of public health. (See SF 500.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the establishment of a needle exchange program by the Iowa department of public health. (See SF 500.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-06SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 500. S.J. 489.
2019-01-29SenateSubcommittee: Zaun, Dawson, and Kinney. S.J. 188.
2019-01-28SenateIntroduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 173.

Same As/Similar To

HF580 (Similar To) 2019-03-04 - Introduced, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 386.
SF500 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 858.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback