IA SF123 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-26 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Goodwin, and Petersen. S.J. 160.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-26 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Goodwin, and Petersen. S.J. 160.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing businesses with income, franchise, moneys and credits, and gross premiums tax credits for providing child care benefits to employees of the business, and including applicability date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act providing businesses with income, franchise, moneys and credits, and gross premiums tax credits for providing child care benefits to employees of the business, and including applicability date provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-26 | Senate | Subcommittee: Dawson, Goodwin, and Petersen. S.J. 160. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 137. |
Same As/Similar To
HF4 (Similar To) 2021-02-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 368.
HF370 (Similar To) 2021-02-16 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Goodwin, and Petersen. S.J. 359.
HF370 (Similar To) 2021-02-16 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Goodwin, and Petersen. S.J. 359.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SF123 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SF123.html |