IA SF122 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-26 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Goodwin, and Petersen. S.J. 160.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-26 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Goodwin, and Petersen. S.J. 160.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the construction of child care facilities by providing developers with sales and use tax refunds and income, franchise, moneys and credits, and gross premiums tax credits, providing for a fee, and including applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the construction of child care facilities by providing developers with sales and use tax refunds and income, franchise, moneys and credits, and gross premiums tax credits, providing for a fee, and including applicability provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-26 | Senate | Subcommittee: Dawson, Goodwin, and Petersen. S.J. 160. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 137. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2 (Similar To) 2021-03-09 - Withdrawn. H.J. 679.
HF362 (Similar To) 2021-03-09 - Withdrawn. H.J. 679.
HF712 (Similar To) 2021-03-11 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Goodwin, and Jochum. S.J. 596.
HF362 (Similar To) 2021-03-09 - Withdrawn. H.J. 679.
HF712 (Similar To) 2021-03-11 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Goodwin, and Jochum. S.J. 596.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SF122 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SF122.html |