IA SF121 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to donations made in a criminal proceeding. (Formerly SSB 1013.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to donations made in a criminal proceeding. (Formerly SSB 1013.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-31 | END OF 2011 ACTIONS | |
2011-03-01 | Subcommittee, Rogers, Alons, and Oldson. H.J. 475. | |
2011-02-23 | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 413. | |
2011-02-23 | Message from Senate. H.J. 410. | |
2011-02-23 | Immediate message. S.J. 380. | |
2011-02-23 | Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays none. S.J. 377. | |
2011-02-01 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 198. | |
2011-02-01 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 194. |