IA SF106 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 307. S.J. 314.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the examination and transportation of dead bodies, including associated fees and costs.(See SF 307.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the examination and transportation of dead bodies, including associated fees and costs.(See SF 307.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-10SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 307. S.J. 314.
2021-02-01SenateSubcommittee recommends passage.
2021-02-01SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 02/01/2021 2:30PM 217 Conference Room.
2021-01-26SenateSubcommittee: Edler, Costello, and Trone Garriott. S.J. 160.
2021-01-20SenateIntroduced, referred to Human Resources. S.J. 126.

Same As/Similar To

SF307 (Similar To) 2021-03-01 - Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 561.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback