IA SCR8 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Subcommittee reassigned: Kraayenbrink, Cournoyer, and Quirmbach. S.J. 68.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Subcommittee reassigned: Kraayenbrink, Cournoyer, and Quirmbach. S.J. 68.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A concurrent resolution to establish a fine arts program interim study committee. (Formerly SSB 1214.)
Title
A concurrent resolution to establish a fine arts program interim study committee. (Formerly SSB 1214.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Kraayenbrink, Cournoyer, and Quirmbach. S.J. 68. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Education. S.J. 859. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 470. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Resolution filed, placed on calendar. S.J. 464. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1214 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/27/2019 1:30PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SCR8 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SCR8.html |