IA HSB95 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF139
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-02 - Voted - Education.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-02 - Voted - Education.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill relating to requirements for the enactment of the state percent of growth and the categorical state percent of growth and including effective date and applicability provisions.
Title
A study bill relating to requirements for the enactment of the state percent of growth and the categorical state percent of growth and including effective date and applicability provisions.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-02 | House | Voted - Education. |
2015-01-29 | House | 12:00PM; House Lounge Education. |
2015-01-28 | House | Education: Jorgensen Chair,Forristall, and Steckman. |
2015-01-28 | House | In Education |
2015-01-28 | House | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
HF139 (Replaced by) 2015-02-05 - Subcommittee, Dvorsky, Quirmbach, and Sinclair. S.J. 241.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=HSB95 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/86/Attachments/HSB95.html |